Bank of Long Beach, National Association

California – Los Angeles – Long Beach

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

19580

1966

FDIC Certificate Number: 19580
FDIC's unique number: 13380
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Orange

Federal Reserve ID Number: 493095
Report Date: 1971-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15585
The date of the last data update: 1997-09-11

1966-05-04 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Long Beach, National Association.
1971-07-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Bank in Los Angeles, California.
1980-01-01 Acquired The Chartered Bank Of London in San Francisco, California.
1988-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Bank in San Francisco, California.
1991-03-23 Moved bank headquarters from Los Angeles, California to San Francisco, California.
1991-09-06 Acquired Heartland Savings And Loan Association in La Mesa, California.
1994-08-12 Acquired Bank Of Newport in Newport Beach, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
1996-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Bank of California, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2002-05-13 Acquired First Western Bank in Simi Valley, California.
2002-10-31 Acquired Valencia Bank & Trust in Santa Clarita, California.
2002-12-31 Acquired Copper Mountain Trust Corporation in Portland, Oregon.
2003-07-01 Acquired Monterey Bay Bank in Watsonville, California.
2003-07-01 Reorganized.
2004-01-16 Acquired Business Bank Of California in San Bernardino, California.
2004-10-28 Acquired Jackson Federal Bank in Fullerton, California.
2008-12-18 Changed name to Union Bank, National Association .
2009-09-24 Acquired Texas First Bank - Winnie in Dallas, Texas.
2010-04-16 Acquired Tamalpais Bank in San Rafael, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-30 Acquired Frontier Bank in Everett, Washington as part of a government assisted transaction.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Long Beach, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Long Beach, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Long Beach, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-360

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.