Bank of North Freedom

Wisconsin – Sauk – North Freedom

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

13056

1903

FDIC Certificate Number: 13056
FDIC's unique number: 8253
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Madison

Federal Reserve ID Number: 240347
Report Date: 1970-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1903-05-04 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of North Freedom.
1970-02-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Reedsburg Bank in Reedsburg, Wisconsin.
2007-11-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Lincoln State Bank in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2008-09-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Harris National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2010-04-23 Acquired Amcore Bank, National Association in Rockford, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-05 Changed name to Bmo Harris Bank National Association .
2011-07-05 Acquired M&i; Marshall And Ilsley Bank in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2011-07-05 Acquired The Harris Bank National Association in Scottsdale, Arizona.
2011-07-05 Acquired M & I Bank National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of North Freedom does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of North Freedom, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of North Freedom will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-80

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.