Bank of North Mississippi

Mississippi – Yalobusha – Oakland

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

11426

1904

FDIC Certificate Number: 11426
FDIC's unique number: 7296
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Memphis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 918842
Report Date: 1986-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1904-03-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of North Mississippi.
1987-04-22 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of BancorpSouth Bank in Tupelo, Mississippi.
1994-04-15 Acquired Security Federal Savings And Loan Association in Jackson, Mississippi as part of a government assisted transaction.
1995-08-01 Acquired First Federal Bank For Savings in Starkville, Mississippi.
1996-12-16 Acquired Laurel Federal Savings And Loan Association in Laurel, Mississippi.
1997-03-03 Acquired Iuka Guaranty Bank in Iuka, Mississippi.
1997-06-20 Changed name to Bancorpsouth Bank .
1997-06-20 Acquired Volunteer Bank in Jackson, Tennessee.
1998-10-30 Acquired First Community Bank Of The South in Fort Deposit, Alabama.
1998-10-30 Acquired Highland Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
1998-12-04 Acquired Merchants Bank in Vicksburg, Mississippi.
1998-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Opelika in Opelika, Alabama.
1999-02-27 Acquired The Home Bank in Guntersville, Alabama.
2000-09-01 Acquired The Bank Of North Arkansas in Melbourne, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of El Dorado in El Dorado, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The City National Bank Of Fort Smith in Fort Smith, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The Citizens National Bank Of Hope in Hope, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First United Bank in Stuttgart, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired Merchants And Planters Bank, National Association in Camden, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Magnolia in Magnolia, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First Republic Bank in Monroe, Louisiana.
2000-09-01 Acquired Firstbank in Texarkana, Texas.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fredonia State Bank in Nacogdoches, Texas.
2000-09-01 Acquired City Bank & Trust Of Shreveport, Louisiana in Shreveport, Louisiana.
2000-09-01 Acquired First United Trust Company, National Association in El Dorado, Arkansas.
2000-10-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Texarkana, Arkansas.
2002-02-28 Acquired Pinnacle Bank in Little Rock, Arkansas.
2004-12-31 Acquired Premier Bank Of Brentwood in Brentwood, Tennessee.
2004-12-31 Acquired The Business Bank in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
2005-12-01 Acquired American State Bank in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
2006-09-01 Acquired First Kensington Bank in Tampa, Florida.
2007-07-02 Acquired The Signature Bank in Springfield, Missouri.

Total assets: $14,452,000
Total deposits: $13,820,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of North Mississippi does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of North Mississippi, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of North Mississippi will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25288

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.