Bank One, West Virginia, Boone, National Association

West Virginia – Boone – Madison

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

6773

1902

FDIC Certificate Number: 6773
FDIC's unique number: 4550
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot

Federal Reserve ID Number: 168535
Report Date: 1994-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 6510
The date of the last data update: 1994-10-13

1902-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Boone National Bank Of Madison.
1986-09-30 Reorganized.
1986-09-30 Changed name to Boone National Bank .
1993-09-13 Changed name to Bank One, West Virginia, Boone, National Association .
1994-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, West Virginia, National Association in Huntington, West Virginia.
2003-08-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $123,952,000
Total deposits: $108,320,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank One, West Virginia, Boone, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank One, West Virginia, Boone, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank One, West Virginia, Boone, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-278

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.