Bank One, Ypsilanti, National Association

Michigan – Washtenaw – Ypsilanti

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

5051

1933

FDIC Certificate Number: 5051
FDIC's unique number: 3373
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Detroit

Federal Reserve ID Number: 157940
Report Date: 1994-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13807
The date of the last data update: 1995-04-13

1933-10-17 Institution established. Original name: The National Bank Of Ypsilanti.
1985-08-01 Reorganized.
1988-04-01 Changed name to Bank One, Ypsilanti, National Association .
1995-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Commercial & Savings Bank in Flint, Michigan.
1996-06-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank .
1996-06-01 Moved bank headquarters from Ypsilanti, Michigan to Flint, Michigan.
1996-06-01 Acquired Second National Bank Of Saginaw in Saginaw, Michigan.
1996-06-01 Acquired State Bank Of Standish in Standish, Michigan.
1996-06-01 Acquired Grayling State Bank in Grayling, Michigan.
1996-06-01 Acquired National Bank Of Royal Oak in Royal Oak, Michigan.
1996-06-01 Acquired Second National Bank Of Bay City in Bay City, Michigan.
1997-07-01 Acquired City Bank in Saint Johns, Michigan.
1997-07-01 Acquired City Bank And Trust Company in Jackson, Michigan.
1997-07-01 Acquired Cb North in Charlevoix, Michigan.
2005-04-25 Acquired F & M Bank-wisconsin in Kaukauna, Wisconsin.
2007-04-28 Acquired Republic Bank in Lansing, Michigan.
2011-06-30 Acquired Citizens Bank Wealth Management, National Association in Flint, Michigan.

Total assets: $151,157,000
Total deposits: $120,390,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank One, Ypsilanti, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank One, Ypsilanti, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank One, Ypsilanti, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-284

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.