Bay State Savings Bank

Massachusetts – Worcester – Worcester

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

90311

1895

FDIC Certificate Number: 90311
FDIC's unique number: 17900
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma

Federal Reserve ID Number: 963002
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB

Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-08-17

1895-03-09 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Bay State Savings Bank.
1985-11-20 Became FDIC insured.

Total assets: $270,599,000
Total deposits: $217,277,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $217,277,000
Equity capital: $27,558,000

Net income: $510,000

Return on Assets: 0.38
Return on Equity: 3.76
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: 1895 Mhc

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bay State Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bay State Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bay State Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-74

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.