Belgrade State Bank

Missouri – Washington – Belgrade

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

12208

1906

FDIC Certificate Number: 12208
FDIC's unique number: 7756
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 761244
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1906-06-19 Institution established. Original name: Belgrade State Bank.
1986-10-06 Moved bank headquarters from Belgrade, Missouri to Potosi, Missouri.
1995-02-16 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
1997-11-04 Moved bank headquarters from Potosi, Missouri to Belgrade, Missouri.

Total assets: $197,692,000
Total deposits: $175,144,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $175,144,000
Equity capital: $21,564,000

Net income: $565,000

Return on Assets: 0.58
Return on Equity: 5.35
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Turner Bancshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Belgrade State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Belgrade State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Belgrade State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-396

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.