Beverly Hills Savings, A Federal Savings and Loan Association

California – Los Angeles – Beverly Hills

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29769

1929

FDIC Certificate Number: 29769
FDIC's unique number: 42603
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 538978
Report Date: 1985-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10

1929-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Beverly Hills Savings And Loan Association.
1985-04-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1985-05-31 Changed name to Beverly Hills Savings, A Federal Savings And Loan Association .
1985-10-01 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Beverly Hills Savings, A Federal Savings and Loan Association in Beverly Hills, California.
1988-12-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1988-12-31 Changed name to Beverly Hills Federal Savings Bank .
1988-12-31 Reorganized.
1991-03-19 Changed name to Beverly Hills Business Bank, Fsb .
1992-12-16 Changed name to Independence One Bank Of California, Fsb .
1995-06-30 Changed name to Michigan Bank, Federal Savings Bank .
1995-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Beverly Hills, California to Troy, Michigan.
1997-08-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Michigan National Bank in Farmington Hills, Michigan.
2001-10-06 Changed name to Standard Federal Bank National Association .
2001-10-06 Acquired Standard Federal Bank in Troy, Michigan.
2005-09-12 Changed name to Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association .
2008-10-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $2,540,461,000
Total deposits: $1,686,407,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Beverly Hills Savings, A Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Beverly Hills Savings, A Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Beverly Hills Savings, A Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-93

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.