Carbondale Savings and Loan Association

Illinois – Jackson – Carbondale

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

30331

1888

FDIC Certificate Number: 30331
FDIC's unique number: 43165
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mount Vernon

Federal Reserve ID Number: 115276
Report Date: 1983-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1888-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Carbondale Savings And Loan Association.
1983-02-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Sparta in Sparta, Illinois.
1987-07-31 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1987-07-31 Changed name to Charter Bank, A Fsb .
1993-05-26 Changed name to Charter Bank, S.B. .
1993-05-26 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1993-10-15 Changed from the Savings Association Insurance Fund to the Bank Insurance Fund.
1993-10-15 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1993-10-15 Reorganized.
1996-05-16 Acquired Community Savings Bank in Marion, Illinois.
1997-01-15 Acquired Home Federal Savings Bank in Carbondale, Illinois.
1999-03-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Planters Bank, National Association in Memphis, Tennessee.
1999-05-07 Acquired Ambank Illinois, National Association in Robinson, Illinois.
1999-05-07 Acquired Ambank Indiana, National Association in Vincennes, Indiana.
1999-05-21 Acquired The First National Bank Of Wetumpka in Wetumpka, Alabama.
1999-05-21 Acquired First Mutual Bank, S.B. in Decatur, Illinois.
1999-06-11 Acquired Bank Of Cumberland in Burkesville, Kentucky.
1999-06-25 Acquired First And Farmers Bank Of Somerset, Inc. in Somerset, Kentucky.
1999-07-09 Acquired The First National Bank And Trust Company Of Corbin in Corbin, Kentucky.
1999-07-09 Acquired First Bank Of East Tennessee, National Association in La Follette, Tennessee.
1999-07-16 Acquired Alvin State Bank in Alvin, Texas.
1999-07-16 Acquired Republic National Bank Of Miami in Miami, Florida.
1999-08-13 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Kentucky, National Association in Paducah, Kentucky.
2000-02-12 Acquired First State Bank Of Covington, Tennessee in Covington, Tennessee.
2002-06-21 Acquired Jefferson Heritage Bank in Denton, Texas.
2003-06-09 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Northwest Tennessee Fsb in Paris, Tennessee.
2004-12-11 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of The Lakeway Area in Morristown, Tennessee.
2005-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Regions Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2005-09-29 Acquired Regions Morgan Keegan Trust, F.S.B. in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-11-04 Acquired Amsouth Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2007-11-30 Reorganized.
2008-08-29 Acquired Integrity Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06 Acquired Firstbank Financial Services in Mcdonough, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Carbondale Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Carbondale Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Carbondale Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-245

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.