Charter Bank

New Mexico – Bernalillo – Albuquerque

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

59030

2010

FDIC Certificate Number: 59030
FDIC's unique number: 500728
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Albuquerque

Federal Reserve ID Number: 4041579
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 718E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

2010-01-22 Institution established. Original name: Charter Bank.
2010-01-22 Acquired Charter Bank in Santa Fe, New Mexico as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2011-10-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Beal Bank, SSB in Plano, Texas.

Total assets: $727,645,000
Total deposits: $264,433,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $264,433,000
Equity capital: $197,699,000

Net income: $-17,872,000

Return on Assets: -4.66
Return on Equity: -17.28
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Charter Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Charter Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Charter Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-124

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.