Charter Bank and Trust

Colorado – Arapahoe – Englewood

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

23267

1980

FDIC Certificate Number: 23267
FDIC's unique number: 16304
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 684950
Report Date: 1996-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1996-08-22

1980-12-05 Institution established. Original name: Charter Bank And Trust.
1987-05-18 Moved bank headquarters from Arapahoe County, Colorado to Englewood, Colorado.
1996-07-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mountain Parks Bank-East in Evergreen, Colorado.
1996-08-01 Acquired The Kiowa State Bank in Kiowa, Colorado.
1996-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mountain Parks Bank in Denver, Colorado.
1996-12-18 Changed name to Colorado Community First State Bank - Co .
1997-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Colorado Community First National Bank in Fort Morgan, Colorado.
1998-04-03 Changed name to Community First National Bank .
1998-05-03 Acquired Community First National Bank in Gunnison, Colorado.
1998-07-01 Acquired Community First National Bank in Greeley, Colorado.
1998-07-01 Acquired Poudre Valley Bank in Fort Collins, Colorado.
1998-07-01 Acquired Community First National Bank in Thornton, Colorado.
1998-07-01 Acquired Community First National Bank in Longmont, Colorado.
2000-08-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community First National Bank in Fargo, North Dakota.
2001-03-22 Acquired Community First State Bank in Vermillion, South Dakota.
2004-12-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of the West in San Francisco, California.
2005-02-08 Acquired Union Safe Deposit Bank in Stockton, California.
2005-12-03 Acquired Commercial Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Omaha, Nebraska.

Total assets: $19,350,000
Total deposits: $17,255,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Charter Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Charter Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Charter Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-263

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.