Chase Manhattan Private Bank, National Association

Florida – Hillsborough – Tampa

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

26566

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26566
FDIC's unique number: 35265
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tampa

Federal Reserve ID Number: 617734
Report Date: 2001-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21177
The date of the last data update: 2002-01-29

1986-02-14 Institution established. Original name: The Chase Bank Of Florida, National Association.
1986-02-14 Acquired Park Bank Of Florida in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1986-12-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1988-03-01 Acquired The Chase Manhattan Trust Company Of Florida, National Association in Palm Beach, Florida.
1989-03-01 Moved bank headquarters from St. Petersburg, Florida to Tampa, Florida.
1990-07-17 Changed name to The Chase Manhattan Bank Of Florida, National Association .
1994-12-09 Changed name to The Chase Manhattan Private Bank , National Association .
1996-11-07 Acquired Chemical Bank, Fsb in Palm Beach, Florida.
1996-11-07 Changed name to Chase Manhattan Private Bank, National Association .
2001-12-01 Acquired J. P. Morgan Fsb in Palm Beach, Florida.
2001-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2002-04-29 Moved bank headquarters from Tampa, Florida to Los Angeles, California.
2003-04-01 Acquired J.p. Morgan Chase Interim National Bank in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-11-15 Reorganized.
2008-08-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $60,995,000
Total deposits: $23,237,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Chase Manhattan Private Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Chase Manhattan Private Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Chase Manhattan Private Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-151

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.