Chemical Bank of Binghamton

New York – Broome – Binghamton

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

21935

1975

FDIC Certificate Number: 21935
FDIC's unique number: 15202
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Syracuse

Federal Reserve ID Number: 14904
Report Date: 1978-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10

1975-02-14 Institution established. Original name: Chemical Bank Of Binghamton.
1978-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Chemical Bank in New York City, New York.
1982-02-03 Moved bank headquarters from Binghamton, New York to New York City, New York.
1991-07-19 Acquired Ensign Federal Savings Bank in New York City, New York.
1991-11-08 Acquired Community National Bank And Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
1992-03-07 Acquired Chemical Bank Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
1992-03-13 Acquired Central Federal Savings Bank in Mineola, New York.
1992-06-20 Acquired Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company in New York City, New York.
1993-07-01 Acquired Texas Commerce Banks in Newark, Delaware.
1996-07-14 Changed name to The Chase Manhattan Bank .
1996-07-14 Acquired The Chase Manhattan Bank in New York City, New York.
1996-12-01 Acquired The Chase Manhattan Bank, National Association in Morristown, New Jersey.
1998-10-01 Acquired Morgan Stanley Trust Company in New York City, New York.
1999-03-05 Acquired Texas Commerce Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-08-01 Acquired Chase Bank Of Texas, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2001-08-01 Acquired Chase Bank Of Texas-san Angelo, National Association in San Angelo, Texas.
2001-11-10 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank .
2001-11-10 Acquired Morgan Guaranty Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2004-11-13 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association .
2004-11-13 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2004-11-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2004-11-13 Moved bank headquarters from New York City, New York to Columbus, Ohio.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $15,225,000
Total deposits: $11,603,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Chemical Bank of Binghamton does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Chemical Bank of Binghamton, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Chemical Bank of Binghamton will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-201

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.