Citizens Bank

Georgia – Warren – Warrenton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

17258

1902

FDIC Certificate Number: 17258
FDIC's unique number: 11282
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta

Federal Reserve ID Number: 205430
Report Date: 2004-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2004-12-29

1902-04-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Bank.
1986-06-02 Reorganized.
2004-11-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Citizens Bank and Trust Company, Inc. in Columbia, South Carolina.
2005-05-01 Acquired People's Community Bank Of South Carolina in Aiken, South Carolina.
2005-05-01 Reorganized.
2005-07-01 Acquired Summit National Bank in Greenville, South Carolina.
2005-07-01 Reorganized.
2008-11-01 Acquired Community Resource Bank, National Association in Orangeburg, South Carolina.
2009-09-25 Acquired Georgian Bank in Atlanta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-17 Acquired Merchants And Farmers Bank Of Comer, Georgia in Comer, Georgia.
2010-07-23 Acquired Williamsburg First National Bank in Kingstree, South Carolina as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-06-03 Acquired Atlantic Bank And Trust in Charleston, South Carolina as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-22 Acquired The Exchange Bank Of South Carolina, Inc. in Kingstree, South Carolina.

Total assets: $48,401,000
Total deposits: $40,106,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Citizens Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-39

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.