Citizens Bank of Southern Indiana

Indiana – Perry – Tell City

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

22674

1978

FDIC Certificate Number: 22674
FDIC's unique number: 15826
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 39747
Report Date: 1998-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-02-04

1978-07-01 Institution established. Original name: Jasper State Bank.
1993-10-11 Changed name to Citizens Bank Of Jasper .
1998-09-12 Acquired Tcb Bank in Tell City, Indiana.
1998-09-12 Changed name to Citizens Bank Of Southern Indiana .
1998-09-12 Moved bank headquarters from Jasper, Indiana to Tell City, Indiana.
1998-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank of MidAmerica in Saint Joseph, Michigan.
1999-04-27 Changed name to Civitas Bank .
2000-03-18 Changed name to Fifth Third Bank, Indiana .
2000-03-18 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2000-12-09 Acquired Ameribank in Holland, Michigan.
2001-05-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank, Indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2001-12-29 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, Southwest, F.S.B. in Scottsdale, Arizona.
2003-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
2005-01-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Florida in Naples, Florida.
2005-02-28 Acquired First National Wealth Management Company in Naples, Florida.
2008-10-31 Acquired Freedom Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Cincinnati, Ohio.

Total assets: $304,770,000
Total deposits: $244,038,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Citizens Bank of Southern Indiana does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank of Southern Indiana, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank of Southern Indiana will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-141

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.