Citizens First National Bank of Wolf Point

Montana – Roosevelt – Wolf Point

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

17353

1954

FDIC Certificate Number: 17353
FDIC's unique number: 11362
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings

Federal Reserve ID Number: 568658
Report Date: 1995-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14715
The date of the last data update: 1995-06-29

1954-09-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens First National Bank Of Wolf Point.
1995-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Community Bank in Glasgow, Montana.
1996-04-01 Acquired Culbertson State Bank Of Culbertson, Montana in Culbertson, Montana.
1998-09-01 Acquired Cheyenne Western Bank in Ashland, Montana.
1999-03-29 Acquired First Community Bank in Froid, Montana.

Total assets: $12,650,000
Total deposits: $11,195,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Citizens First National Bank of Wolf Point does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Citizens First National Bank of Wolf Point, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens First National Bank of Wolf Point will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-352

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.