Citizens of Texas Savings and Loan Association

Texas – Harris – Baytown

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

31163

1960

FDIC Certificate Number: 31163
FDIC's unique number: 43997
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 955173
Report Date: 1990-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1999-06-09

1960-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Of Texas Savings And Loan Association.
1989-03-09 Entered into a conservatorship.
1990-08-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of West Loop Savings and Loan Association in Houston, Texas.
1993-12-31 Moved bank headquarters from Baytown, Texas to Houston, Texas.
1995-01-10 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-01-10 Changed name to Charter Bank, S.S.B. .
1995-01-10 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1995-01-10 Reorganized.
1996-04-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Charter National Bank - Houston in Houston, Texas.
1996-08-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank of Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1997-09-19 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Texas in Houston, Texas.
1998-02-19 Acquired Boatmen's First National Bank Of Amarillo in Amarillo, Texas.
1998-05-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-07-09 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Austin in Austin, Texas.
1998-08-06 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Brunswick, Georgia.
1998-10-08 Acquired Barnett Bank, National Association in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-10-08 Acquired Community Bank Of The Islands in Sanibel, Florida.
1998-11-12 Acquired Nationsbank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1999-04-08 Acquired Bank Of America Texas, National Association in Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Reorganized.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $51,995,000
Total deposits: $109,501,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Citizens of Texas Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Citizens of Texas Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens of Texas Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-196

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.