Citizens State Bank in Galena

Kansas – Cherokee – Galena

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

23260

1980

FDIC Certificate Number: 23260
FDIC's unique number: 16298
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo

Federal Reserve ID Number: 986056
Report Date: 1997-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1997-10-03

1980-11-24 Institution established. Original name: Citizens State Bank In Galena.
1980-11-24 Acquired Citizens State Bank Of Galena in Galena, Kansas.
1997-09-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Bank and Trust in Neosho, Missouri.

Total assets: $18,315,000
Total deposits: $16,141,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Citizens State Bank in Galena does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Citizens State Bank in Galena, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens State Bank in Galena will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-267

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.