Citizens Trust Bank

Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

8033

1921

FDIC Certificate Number: 8033
FDIC's unique number: 5114
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta

Federal Reserve ID Number: 680130
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 11
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-08-28

1921-06-18 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Trust Company.
1973-10-24 Changed name to Citizens Trust Bank .
1994-04-22 Acquired Southern Federal Savings Association Of Georgia in Atlanta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
1998-01-30 Acquired First Southern Bank in Lithonia, Georgia.
2000-03-13 Acquired Mutual Federal Savings Bank in Atlanta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2003-03-01 Acquired Citizens Federal Savings Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.

Total assets: $398,030,000
Total deposits: $346,492,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $346,492,000
Equity capital: $46,551,000

Net income: $418,000

Return on Assets: 0.21
Return on Equity: 1.84
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Citizens Bancshares Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Citizens Trust Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Citizens Trust Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Trust Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-310

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.