Codding Bank

California – Sonoma – Rohnert Park

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

27613

1989

FDIC Certificate Number: 27613
FDIC's unique number: 40447
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: San Francisco

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1409806
Report Date: 1994-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-11-15

1989-10-30 Institution established. Original name: Codding Bank Of Rohnert Park.
1992-06-18 Changed name to Codding Bank .
1994-11-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National Bank of the Redwoods in Santa Rosa, California.
1997-03-24 Acquired Allied Savings Bank, Fsb in Santa Rosa, California.
2005-03-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Westamerica Bank in San Rafael, California.
2008-01-14 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2008-01-14 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2009-02-06 Acquired County Bank in Merced, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-08-20 Acquired Sonoma Valley Bank in Sonoma, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-05-27 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2011-05-27 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.

Total assets: $50,761,000
Total deposits: $44,788,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Codding Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Codding Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Codding Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-121

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.