Colonial Bank

Missouri – St. Louis – Saint Louis

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19587

1966

FDIC Certificate Number: 19587
FDIC's unique number: 13386
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 950057
Report Date: 1998-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1998-09-23

1966-05-16 Institution established. Original name: The Colonial Bank.
1991-03-13 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1994-01-29 Acquired The Village Bank Of St. Louis County in Ballwin, Missouri.
1994-01-29 Changed name to Colonial Bank .
1998-09-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank of St. Louis in Clayton, Missouri.
2001-03-01 Acquired Midamerica Bank Of St. Clair County in O Fallon, Illinois.
2007-11-05 Acquired First National Bank Of Millstadt in Millstadt, Illinois.

Total assets: $218,627,000
Total deposits: $196,663,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Colonial Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Colonial Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Colonial Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-356

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.