Colony Federal Savings Bank

Pennsylvania – Beaver – Monaca

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

33032

1990

FDIC Certificate Number: 33032
FDIC's unique number: 46262
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wexford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 597171
Report Date: 1991-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-02

1990-04-05 Institution established. Original name: Colony Federal Savings Bank.
1990-04-05 Acquired Colony Savings Bank, Fsb in Monaca, Pennsylvania.
1991-10-11 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Beaver Trust Company in Beaver, Pennsylvania.
1993-09-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Western Bank, National Association in New Castle, Pennsylvania.
1997-09-08 Acquired First Western Bank, F.S.B. in Sharon, Pennsylvania.
1998-09-10 Acquired First Western Trust Services Company in New Castle, Pennsylvania.
1998-09-11 Reorganized.
1999-08-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sky Bank in Salineville, Ohio.
2000-04-15 Acquired The Mahoning National Bank Of Youngstown in Youngstown, Ohio.
2001-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sky Bank in Salineville, Ohio.
2002-10-26 Acquired Three Rivers Bank And Trust Company in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2003-05-16 Acquired Metropolitan Bank And Trust in Highland Hills, Ohio.
2003-12-13 Acquired Great Lakes Bank in Mentor, Ohio.
2004-07-02 Acquired The Second National Bank Of Warren in Warren, Ohio.
2004-12-03 Acquired Prospect Bank in Columbus, Ohio.
2005-06-03 Acquired Belmont National Bank in Wheeling, West Virginia.
2005-12-03 Acquired Falls Bank in Stow, Ohio.
2006-11-03 Acquired Union Federal Bank Of Indianapolis in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2006-12-09 Acquired Perpetual State Bank in Wellsville, Ohio.
2007-09-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Huntington National Bank in Columbus, Ohio.
2009-10-02 Acquired Warren Bank in Warren, Michigan as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $248,121,000
Total deposits: $200,006,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Colony Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Colony Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Colony Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-377

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.