Commercial Bank

Kentucky – Bell – Middlesboro

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

274

1931

FDIC Certificate Number: 274
FDIC's unique number: 219
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Knoxville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 656911
Report Date: 1996-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-01-13

1931-02-21 Institution established. Original name: Commercial Bank.
1997-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Trust Bank, National Association in Pikeville, Kentucky.
1998-12-31 Acquired Community Trust Bank Of West Virginia, National Association in Williamson, West Virginia.
2000-12-29 Acquired Community Trust Bank, Fsb in Campbellsville, Kentucky.
2001-01-26 Acquired The Bank Of Mt. Vernon in Richmond, Kentucky.
2002-03-18 Acquired Citizens National Bank & Trust Of Hazard in Hazard, Kentucky.
2003-01-01 Changed name to Community Trust Bank, Inc. .
2003-01-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2003-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2005-06-11 Acquired Heritage Community Bank in Danville, Kentucky.
2011-01-22 Acquired The First National Bank Of La Follette in La Follette, Tennessee.

Total assets: $101,114,000
Total deposits: $86,591,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Commercial Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Commercial Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Commercial Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.