Community First Bank

Kentucky – Mason – Maysville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

10518

1907

FDIC Certificate Number: 10518
FDIC's unique number: 6734
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington

Federal Reserve ID Number: 659510
Report Date: 1997-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-08-26

1907-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Farmers & Traders Bank Of Mt. Olivet.
1980-06-17 Changed name to The Farmers & Traders Bank Of Mt. Olivet, Inc. .
1994-07-15 Changed name to Community First Bank .
1994-10-03 Acquired Community First Bank Of May's Lick in May's Lick, Kentucky.
1996-12-30 Moved bank headquarters from Mount Olivet, Kentucky to Maysville, Kentucky.
1997-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community First Bank, National Association in Maysville, Kentucky.
1997-08-24 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1999-06-25 Acquired Community First Bank Of Kentucky in Warsaw, Kentucky.
2000-09-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Integra Bank National Association in Evansville, Indiana.
2001-01-31 Acquired West Kentucky Bank in Madisonville, Kentucky.
2007-04-10 Acquired Prairie Bank And Trust Company in Bridgeview, Illinois.
2011-07-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Old National Bank in Evansville, Indiana.
2011-07-29 FDIC closing information for Integra Bank National Association : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/integra.html.

Total assets: $45,884,000
Total deposits: $38,994,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Community First Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Community First Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community First Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-406

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.