Continental Bank Guardian

Wisconsin – Milwaukee – Milwaukee

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19392

1965

FDIC Certificate Number: 19392
FDIC's unique number: 13197
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Milwaukee

Federal Reserve ID Number: 438144
Report Date: 1983-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1965-03-15 Institution established. Original name: Guardian State Bank.
1980-08-20 Changed name to Continental Bank Guardian .
1983-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Continental Bank & Trust Co. in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1983-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Continental Bank and Trust Company in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1987-06-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Interstate Bank of Wisconsin in New Berlin, Wisconsin.
1990-07-18 Changed name to Norwest Bank Wisconsin .
1992-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Norwest Bank Wisconsin, National Association in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1993-10-22 Acquired University Bank in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
1994-08-26 Acquired Norwest Bank Wisconsin Waupun, National Association in Waupun, Wisconsin.
1995-03-24 Acquired Norwest Bank Wisconsin Eau Claire, National Association in Eau Claire, Wisconsin.
1998-11-07 Acquired Midamerica Bank North in Phillips, Wisconsin.
1998-11-07 Acquired Midamerica Bank in Dodgeville, Wisconsin.
2000-06-24 Changed name to Wells Fargo Bank Wisconsin, National Association .
2000-06-24 Acquired Norwest Bank La Crosse, National Association in La Crosse, Wisconsin.
2000-06-24 Acquired Norwest Bank Hudson, National Association in Hudson, Wisconsin.
2002-07-13 Acquired The First National Bank And Trust Company Of Baraboo in Baraboo, Wisconsin.
2002-07-13 Acquired Meridian Capital Bank, National Association in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2004-02-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-04-24 Acquired Pacific Northwest Bank in Oak Harbor, Washington.
2005-09-24 Acquired First Community Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2006-06-17 Acquired State Bank Of Rogers in Rogers, Minnesota.
2006-09-23 Acquired Fremont National Bank Of Canon City in Canon City, Colorado.
2006-09-23 Acquired Centennial Bank Of Pueblo in Pueblo, Colorado.
2007-09-22 Acquired Placer Sierra Bank in Auburn, California.
2008-03-15 Acquired Greater Bay Bank, National Association in Palo Alto, California.
2008-10-18 Acquired The Jackson State Bank in Jackson, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Shoshone First Bank in Cody, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired First State Bank Of Pinedale in Pinedale, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Sheridan State Bank in Sheridan, Wyoming.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction-downtown, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-02-02 Acquired Wells Fargo Financial Bank in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2009-04-25 Acquired Century Bank, National Association in Texarkana, Texas.
2009-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, National Association in North Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-11-07 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Colorado, Interim National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $21,891,000
Total deposits: $19,924,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Continental Bank Guardian does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Continental Bank Guardian, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Continental Bank Guardian will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-63

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.