Davy Crockett Federal Savings Bank

Texas – Houston – Crockett

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32224

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32224
FDIC's unique number: 45058
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 970475
Report Date: 1991-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1991-09-27

1984-06-11 Institution established. Original name: Fidelity Savings-irving, FA.
1987-08-31 Moved bank headquarters from Irivng, Texas to Crockett, Texas.
1987-08-31 Changed name to Davy Crockett Federal Savings Bank .
1987-08-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-09-13 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Davy Crockett Federal Savings Association in Crockett, Texas.
1992-03-06 Ceased operations as a result of a government supervised payoff, liquidation or closing. No active institution received any of deposits.
1992-03-06 Government conservatorship or bridge bank resolved.

Total assets: $50,532,000
Total deposits: $48,311,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Davy Crockett Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Davy Crockett Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Davy Crockett Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-171

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.