Dearborn Bank and Trust Company

Michigan – Wayne – Dearborn

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

17256

1953

FDIC Certificate Number: 17256
FDIC's unique number: 11281
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Detroit

Federal Reserve ID Number: 966843
Report Date: 1989-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1953-08-26 Institution established. Original name: Dearborn Bank And Trust Company.
1972-09-28 Changed name to Bank Of Dearborn .
1974-03-19 Changed name to Dearborn Bank And Trust Company .
1989-12-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Comerica Bank-Detroit in Detroit, Michigan.
1991-05-01 Changed name to Comerica Bank .
1991-05-01 Acquired Comerica Bank National Association in Jackson, Michigan.
1992-09-14 Acquired Manufacturers Bank, National Association in Detroit, Michigan.
1998-12-12 Acquired Comerica Bank & Trust, Federal Savings Bank in Boca Raton, Florida.
2003-06-30 Acquired Comerica Bank - Texas in Dallas, Texas.
2003-06-30 Acquired Comerica Bank-california in San Jose, California.
2007-11-01 Moved bank headquarters from Detroit, Michigan to Dallas, Texas.
2007-11-01 Reorganized.
2011-07-28 Acquired Sterling Bank in Houston, Texas.

Total assets: $272,304,000
Total deposits: $239,160,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Dearborn Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Dearborn Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Dearborn Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-46

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.