Deseret Bank

Utah – Utah – Pleasant Grove

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

12589

1911

FDIC Certificate Number: 12589
FDIC's unique number: 7994
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Salt Lake City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 585673
Report Date: 1990-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-01-28

1911-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Pleasant Grove.
1982-05-03 Acquired State Bank Of Lehi in Lehi, Utah.
1982-05-03 Changed name to Deseret Bank .
1982-05-03 Acquired Mountain View Bank in American Fork, Utah.
1982-05-03 Acquired Geneva State Bank in Orem, Utah.
1990-11-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Security Bank of Utah, National Association in Ogden, Utah.
1991-12-26 Acquired Utah Bank And Trust in Bountiful, Utah.
1993-04-01 Acquired Dixie State Bank in St. George, Utah.
1993-11-30 Acquired First Professional Bank in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1994-05-19 Acquired Community First Bank in Clearfield, Utah.
1996-06-21 Changed name to First Security Bank, National Association .
1996-06-21 Acquired First Security Bank Of Idaho, National Association in Boise, Idaho.
1997-05-22 Reorganized.
1997-05-23 Acquired First Security Bank Of Oregon in Salem, Oregon.
1997-11-24 Acquired First Security Bank Of Wyoming in Rock Springs, Wyoming.
2001-04-21 Changed name to Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, National Association .

Total assets: $111,047,000
Total deposits: $98,220,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Deseret Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Deseret Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Deseret Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-313

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.