East Des Moines National Bank

Iowa – Polk – Des Moines

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

18765

1963

FDIC Certificate Number: 18765
FDIC's unique number: 12629
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines

Federal Reserve ID Number: 657440
Report Date: 1997-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15085
The date of the last data update: 1997-05-30

1963-04-30 Institution established. Original name: East Des Moines National Bank.
1997-05-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community State Bank in Ankeny, Iowa.
2003-04-01 Changed name to Community State Bank, National Association .
2003-04-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.

Total assets: $103,272,000
Total deposits: $88,082,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

East Des Moines National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with East Des Moines National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and East Des Moines National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-301

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.