Farmers and Merchants Bank

Wisconsin – Clark – Greenwood

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

13059

1912

FDIC Certificate Number: 13059
FDIC's unique number: 8255
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Eau Claire

Federal Reserve ID Number: 739542
Report Date: 1994-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-06-28

1912-10-14 Institution established. Original name: Farmers And Merchants Bank.
1994-05-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank, National Association in Shawano, Wisconsin.
1999-06-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Associated Bank Green Bay, National Association in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
2001-04-20 Changed name to Associated Bank, National Association .
2001-04-20 Acquired Associated Bank Milwaukee in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2001-04-20 Acquired Associated Bank, National Association in Neenah, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank Lakeshore, National Association in Manitowoc, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank North in Wausau, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank South Central in Madison, Wisconsin.
2003-09-12 Acquired Associated Card Services Bank, National Association in Stevens Point, Wisconsin.
2003-11-21 Acquired Associated Bank Illinois, National Association in Rockford, Illinois.
2005-02-19 Acquired First Federal Capital Bank in La Crosse, Wisconsin.
2005-07-15 Acquired Associated Bank Minnesota, National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2005-07-15 Acquired Associated Bank Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2005-10-21 Reorganized.
2005-11-04 Acquired State Financial Bank, National Association in Hales Corners, Wisconsin.
2007-06-29 Acquired The First National Bank Of Hudson in Woodbury, Minnesota.

Total assets: $24,995,000
Total deposits: $21,085,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Farmers and Merchants Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Farmers and Merchants Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers and Merchants Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-77

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.