Farmers State Bank

Indiana – Daviess – Plainville

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

15552

1908

FDIC Certificate Number: 15552
FDIC's unique number: 9846
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 742841
Report Date: 1974-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1908-04-13 Institution established. Original name: Farmers State Bank.
1974-04-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Peoples National Bank and Trust Company of Washington in Washington, Indiana.
1985-10-04 Reorganized.
1997-03-04 Acquired The Union Bank in Loogootee, Indiana.
1998-07-20 Changed name to Peoples National Bank .
2002-03-05 Changed name to Peoples Bank .
2002-03-05 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2002-03-05 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2006-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of German American Bancorp in Jasper, Indiana.
2011-01-01 Acquired Bank Of Evansville in Evansville, Indiana.

Total assets: $1,900,000
Total deposits: $1,688,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Farmers State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Farmers State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Farmers State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-163

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.