Fidelity Federal Savings Bank

Illinois – Cook – Chicago

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

30221

1906

FDIC Certificate Number: 30221
FDIC's unique number: 43055
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago

Federal Reserve ID Number: 230777
Report Date: 2003-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2003-07-31

1906-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Fidelity Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Chicago.
1989-01-17 Changed name to Fidelity Federal Savings Bank .
1989-01-17 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1993-12-15 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2003-07-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mid America Bank, FSB in Clarendon Hills, Illinois.
2003-12-01 Acquired St. Francis Bank, F.S.B. in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2004-11-01 Acquired Chesterfield Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2006-02-01 Acquired Efs Bank in Elgin, Illinois.
2007-09-21 Changed name to Midamerica Bank, Fsb .
2008-02-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
2008-12-30 Acquired New England Trust Company, National Association in Warwick, Rhode Island.
2009-09-30 Reorganized.
2009-11-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.

Total assets: $649,096,000
Total deposits: $459,110,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Fidelity Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Fidelity Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Fidelity Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-252

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.