First American National Bank of Anderson County

Tennessee – Anderson – Clinton

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

9190

1894

FDIC Certificate Number: 9190
FDIC's unique number: 5884
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Knoxville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 210135
Report Date: 1983-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17909
The date of the last data update: 1995-10-11

1894-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Union-peoples Bank.
1981-01-01 Changed name to First American Bank Of Anderson County .
1983-08-14 Changed name to First American National Bank Of Anderson County .
1984-02-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First American National Bank of Knoxville in Knoxville, Tennessee.
1984-03-30 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Not Granted.
1986-11-11 Acquired First American National Bank in Maryville, Tennessee.
1988-07-01 Changed name to First American National Bank .
1988-07-01 Acquired The First American National Bank Of Jefferson City in Jefferson City, Tennessee.
1988-09-01 Acquired First American National Bank in Rockwood, Tennessee.
1990-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First American National Bank in Nashville, Tennessee.
1994-04-01 Acquired First Fidelity Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Crossville, Tennessee.
1995-09-30 Acquired First American Trust Company, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1995-11-01 Acquired Heritage Federal Bank For Savings in Kingsport, Tennessee.
1996-03-11 Acquired Citizens Bank in Smithville, Tennessee.
1996-03-11 Acquired First City Bank in Murfreesboro, Tennessee.
1997-01-02 Acquired Communityfirst Bank in Hartsville, Tennessee.
1997-07-01 Acquired First American National Bank Of Kentucky in Bowling Green, Kentucky.
1998-06-01 Acquired Victory Bank And Trust Company in Cordova, Tennessee.
1998-09-01 Acquired Deposit Guaranty National Bank in Jackson, Mississippi.
1998-10-01 Acquired The Middle Tennessee Bank in Columbia, Tennessee.
1998-10-01 Acquired Cheatham State Bank in Kingston Springs, Tennessee.
1998-11-20 Acquired Valley Bank in Sweetwater, Tennessee.
1998-11-20 Acquired Pioneer Bank in Chattanooga, Tennessee.
1999-06-30 Acquired Peoples Bank in Dickson, Tennessee.
1999-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of AmSouth Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2000-03-31 Acquired First American Federal Savings Bank in Dalton, Georgia.
2006-11-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Regions Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2007-11-30 Reorganized.
2008-08-29 Acquired Integrity Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06 Acquired Firstbank Financial Services in Mcdonough, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $100,582,000
Total deposits: $88,974,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First American National Bank of Anderson County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First American National Bank of Anderson County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First American National Bank of Anderson County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-379

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.