First Bank of Beverly Hills, FSB

California – Los Angeles – Beverly Hills

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32219

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32219
FDIC's unique number: 45053
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 966571
Report Date: 1997-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-02-10

1984-05-31 Institution established. Original name: First Savings And Loan Association.
1990-06-05 Changed name to First Bank Of Beverly Hills, SSB .
1993-04-22 Changed name to First Bank Of Beverly Hills, Fsb .
1993-04-22 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1997-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Bank of Beverly Hills, F.S.B. in Beverly Hills, California.
2000-06-19 Moved bank headquarters from Beverly Hills, California to Calabasas, California.
2000-06-29 Moved bank headquarters from Calabasas, California to Beverly Hills, California.
2000-12-12 Moved bank headquarters from Beverly Hills, California to Calabasas, California.
2005-09-01 Changed name to First Bank Of Beverly Hills .
2005-09-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2005-09-01 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2005-09-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2009-04-24 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
2009-04-24 FDIC closing information for First Bank Of Beverly Hills : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/beverlyhills.html.

Total assets: $110,644,000
Total deposits: $96,973,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Bank of Beverly Hills, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Bank of Beverly Hills, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Bank of Beverly Hills, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3042

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.