First Bank of San Luis Obispo

California – San Luis Obispo – San Luis Obispo

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

23265

1980

FDIC Certificate Number: 23265
FDIC's unique number: 16302
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 996466
Report Date: 2005-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2005-09-19

1980-11-24 Institution established. Original name: First Bank Of San Luis Obispo.
2005-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Pacific Capital Bank, National Association in Santa Barbara, California.
2006-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from San Luis Obispo, California to Santa Barbara, California.
2011-05-26 Changed name to Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association .

Total assets: $301,723,000
Total deposits: $257,929,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Bank of San Luis Obispo does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Bank of San Luis Obispo, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Bank of San Luis Obispo will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-264

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.