First Bank & Trust, Bryan, Texas

Texas – Brazos – Bryan

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

1178

1909

FDIC Certificate Number: 1178
FDIC's unique number: 808
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin

Federal Reserve ID Number: 237552
Report Date: 1988-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1909-10-01 Institution established. Original name: First Bank & Trust, Bryan, Texas.
1989-02-09 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First American Bank SSB in Bryan, Texas.
1990-03-08 Acquired University National Bank Of College Station in College Station, Texas.
1991-02-28 Acquired United Citizens Bank, National Association in College Station, Texas.
1996-07-25 Changed name to First American Bank SSB .
1996-07-25 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1996-12-20 Acquired First State Bank in Caldwell, Texas.
2000-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First American Bank, SSB in Bryan, Texas.
2003-12-11 Acquired Security Bank National Association in Garland, Texas.
2005-03-31 Changed name to Citibank Texas, National Association .
2005-03-31 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2005-03-31 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2005-03-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2005-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Bryan, Texas to Dallas, Texas.
2006-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.

Total assets: $148,098,000
Total deposits: $144,662,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Bank & Trust, Bryan, Texas does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Bank & Trust, Bryan, Texas, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Bank & Trust, Bryan, Texas will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-114

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.