First Industrial Bank & Trust Company

Louisiana – Jefferson – Metairie

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

26565

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26565
FDIC's unique number: 35264
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baton Rouge

Federal Reserve ID Number: 325235
Report Date: 1987-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1986-01-17 Institution established. Original name: First Industrial Bank & Trust Company.
1986-01-17 Acquired First Progressive Bank in Metairie, Louisiana.
1986-05-02 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1987-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank in Covington, Louisiana.
1988-11-18 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Capital One, National Association in Mclean, Virginia.
1989-02-16 Acquired Louisiana Bank & Trust Company in Shreveport, Louisiana.
1989-03-16 Acquired Livingston Bank in Denham Springs, Louisiana.
1989-08-18 Acquired Evangeline Federal Savings And Loan Association in Lafayette, Louisiana.
1989-09-15 Acquired First Savings Of Louisiana, Fsa in La Place, Louisiana.
1989-10-06 Acquired River City Federal Savings Bank in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
1994-07-01 Acquired Bastrop National Bank in Bastrop, Louisiana.
1994-07-01 Acquired First Commercial Bank, Franklin, Louisiana in Franklin, Louisiana.
1994-08-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Jefferson Parish in Gretna, Louisiana.
1994-08-01 Acquired First National Bank Of West Monroe in West Monroe, Louisiana.
1994-08-01 Acquired Southern National Bank At Tallulah in Tallulah, Louisiana.
1994-12-31 Acquired First State Bank And Trust Company in Franklinton, Louisiana.
1994-12-31 Acquired Pioneer Bank & Trust Company in Shreveport, Louisiana.
1995-03-01 Acquired American Bank in Norco, Louisiana.
1995-05-01 Acquired State Bank And Trust Company in Donaldsonville, Louisiana.
1995-07-01 Acquired Bank Of St. John in Reserve, Louisiana.
1995-07-01 Acquired Progressive Bank And Trust Company in Houma, Louisiana.
1996-01-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Lake Providence in Lake Providence, Louisiana.
1996-01-15 Acquired Bunkie Bank & Trust Company in Bunkie, Louisiana.
1996-08-26 Acquired The Calcasieu-marine National Bank Of Lake Charles in Lake Charles, Louisiana.
1996-10-01 Acquired St. Bernard Bank & Trust Co. in Arabi, Louisiana.
1998-01-01 Acquired First National Bank In Mansfield in Mansfield, Louisiana.
1998-02-01 Acquired Argentbank in Thibodaux, Louisiana.
1998-07-01 Acquired Peoples Bank & Trust Company in Minden, Louisiana.
1999-01-01 Acquired Hibernia National Bank Of Texas in Texarkana, Texas.
1999-03-08 Acquired First Service Bank in Marshall, Texas.
1999-05-21 Acquired Beaumont Trust Company, National Association in Beaumont, Texas.
2004-05-13 Acquired Coastal Banc, S.S.B. in Houston, Texas.
2006-04-24 Changed name to Capital One, National Association .
2007-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from New Orleans, Louisiana to Mclean, Virginia.
2007-07-01 Acquired Capital One, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-08-01 Acquired North Fork Bank in Mattituck, New York.
2008-03-08 Acquired Superior Savings Of New England, National Association in Branford, Connecticut.
2009-07-30 Acquired Chevy Chase Bank, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2011-04-01 Reorganized.

Total assets: $43,529,000
Total deposits: $42,213,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Industrial Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Industrial Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Industrial Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-154

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.