First Midwest Bank/Illinois, National Association

Illinois – La Salle – Streator

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

3743

1882

FDIC Certificate Number: 3743
FDIC's unique number: 2408
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Princeton

Federal Reserve ID Number: 532248
Report Date: 1988-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 2681
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1882-05-08 Institution established. Original name: The Streator National Bank.
1985-07-01 Changed name to First Midwest Bank/streator, A National Association .
1987-11-12 Acquired First Midwest Bank/joliet, National Association in Joliet, Illinois.
1987-11-12 Changed name to First Midwest Bank/illinois, National Association .
1988-05-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Midwest Bank/Illinois, National Association in Joliet, Illinois.
1990-05-08 Acquired Peoples Savings And Loan Association, FA in Streator, Illinois.
1990-11-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Midwest Bank/Illinois, National Association in Plainfield, Illinois.
1990-11-09 Acquired Home Savings, A Federal Savings And Loan Association in Joliet, Illinois.
1995-05-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Midwest Bank, National Association in Moline, Illinois.
1996-11-30 Acquired First Midwest Bank/quad Cities, National Association in Moline, Illinois.
1998-02-23 Moved bank headquarters from Moline, Illinois to Mchenry, Illinois.
1998-02-23 Acquired Mchenry State Bank in Mchenry, Illinois.
1998-10-26 Acquired Heritage Bank in Blue Island, Illinois.
1999-04-12 Moved bank headquarters from Mchenry, Illinois to Buffalo Grove, Illinois.
1999-12-31 Acquired Heritage Bank, National Association in Monee, Illinois.
2001-06-29 Changed name to First Midwest Bank .
2001-06-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2001-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2001-06-29 Acquired First Midwest Trust Company, National Association in Seneca, Illinois.
2002-05-07 Moved bank headquarters from Buffalo Grove, Illinois to Itasca, Illinois.
2004-02-14 Acquired Covest Banc, National Association in Des Plaines, Illinois.
2006-05-13 Acquired Bank Calumet National Association in Hammond, Indiana.
2009-10-23 Acquired First Dupage Bank in Westmont, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-23 Acquired Peotone Bank And Trust Company in Peotone, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-08-13 Acquired Palos Bank And Trust Company in Palos Heights, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $465,620,000
Total deposits: $403,341,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Midwest Bank/Illinois, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Midwest Bank/Illinois, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Midwest Bank/Illinois, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-188

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.