First Morris Bank and Trust

New Jersey – Morris – Morristown

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19975

1969

FDIC Certificate Number: 19975
FDIC's unique number: 13717
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 926203
Report Date: 2007-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-06-11

1969-06-25 Institution established. Original name: First Morris Bank.
1999-03-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1999-05-18 Changed name to First Morris Bank And Trust .
2007-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Provident Bank in Jersey City, New Jersey.

Total assets: $563,852,000
Total deposits: $508,646,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Morris Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Morris Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Morris Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-216

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.