First National Bank and Trust Company

Florida – Orange – Orlando

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

35217

1999

FDIC Certificate Number: 35217
FDIC's unique number: 76184
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tampa

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2858858
Report Date: 2006-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23895
The date of the last data update: 2006-10-25

1999-11-15 Institution established. Original name: Century National Bank.
2005-04-30 Reorganized.
2005-04-30 Changed name to First National Bank And Trust Company .
2006-08-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Seacoast National Bank in Stuart, Florida.

Total assets: $456,961,000
Total deposits: $393,617,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First National Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First National Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-257

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.