First National Bank in Marlinton

West Virginia – Pocahontas – Marlinton

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

6774

1933

FDIC Certificate Number: 6774
FDIC's unique number: 4551
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot

Federal Reserve ID Number: 762139
Report Date: 1999-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13783
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-14

1933-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank In Marlinton.
1989-12-31 Reorganized.
1999-04-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of City National Bank of West Virginia in Charleston, West Virginia.
1999-04-26 Acquired Bank Of Raleigh in Beckley, West Virginia.
1999-04-26 Acquired Greenbrier Valley National Bank in Lewisburg, West Virginia.
1999-04-26 Acquired The National Bank Of Summers Of Hinton in Hinton, West Virginia.
1999-04-26 Acquired The Twentieth Street Bank in Huntington, West Virginia.
2005-05-20 Acquired Classic Bank in Ashland, Kentucky.

Total assets: $83,411,000
Total deposits: $61,630,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First National Bank in Marlinton does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First National Bank in Marlinton, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank in Marlinton will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-272

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.