First National Bank of Moore Haven

Florida – Glades – Moore Haven

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

21612

1974

FDIC Certificate Number: 21612
FDIC's unique number: 14947
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tampa

Federal Reserve ID Number: 277932
Report Date: 1981-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16335
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1974-06-05 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Moore Haven.
1982-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Flagship Bank of Okeechobee in Okeechobee, Florida.
1984-01-16 Changed name to Barnett Bank Of Lake Okeechobee .
1996-06-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Barnett Bank, National Association in Jacksonville, Florida.
1996-09-28 Acquired Barnett Bank Of Marion County, National Association in Ocala, Florida.
1996-09-28 Acquired Barnett Bank Of Southwest Florida in Sarasota, Florida.
1996-09-28 Acquired Barnett Bank Of Pinellas County in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1997-08-28 Acquired Barnett Bank Of Southeast Georgia National Association in Brunswick, Georgia.
1998-10-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-11-12 Acquired Nationsbank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1999-04-08 Acquired Bank Of America Texas, National Association in Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Reorganized.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $6,748,000
Total deposits: $5,354,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First National Bank of Moore Haven does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First National Bank of Moore Haven, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First National Bank of Moore Haven will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-59

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.