First Niagara Bank, National Association

New York – Erie – Buffalo

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

16004

1870

FDIC Certificate Number: 16004
FDIC's unique number: 10234
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Syracuse

Federal Reserve ID Number: 517900
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 24968

Number of Domestic Offices: 364
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-06-09

1870-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Lockport Savings Bank.
1998-04-17 Reorganized.
1998-04-17 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2000-02-21 Changed name to First Niagara Bank .
2000-03-24 Acquired Albion Federal Savings And Loan Association in Albion, New York.
2002-11-08 Acquired Cayuga Bank in Auburn, New York.
2002-11-08 Acquired Cortland Savings Bank in Cortland, New York.
2002-11-08 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2002-11-08 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2003-01-17 Acquired Savings Bank Of The Finger Lakes, Fsb in Geneva, New York.
2004-01-16 Acquired The Troy Savings Bank in Troy, New York.
2005-01-14 Acquired Hudson River Bank & Trust Company in Hudson, New York.
2008-02-15 Acquired Greater Buffalo Savings Bank in Buffalo, New York.
2009-10-27 Moved bank headquarters from Lockport, New York to Buffalo, New York.
2010-04-09 Reorganized.
2010-04-09 Changed name to First Niagara Bank, National Association .
2010-04-09 Acquired The Harleysville National Bank And Trust Company in Harleysville, Pennsylvania.
2010-04-09 Acquired First Niagara Commercial Bank in Lockport, New York.
2010-04-09 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2010-04-09 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2010-04-09 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2011-04-15 Acquired Newalliance Bank in New Haven, Connecticut.

Total assets: $30,804,513,000
Total deposits: $19,302,695,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $19,302,695,000
Equity capital: $4,004,484,000

Net income: $74,298,000

Return on Assets: 0.61
Return on Equity: 4.91
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: First Niagara Financial Group, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Niagara Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Niagara Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Niagara Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-337

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.