First of America Bank - Springfield, National Association

Illinois – Sangamon – Springfield

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

3740

1886

FDIC Certificate Number: 3740
FDIC's unique number: 2405
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Il

Federal Reserve ID Number: 528344
Report Date: 1994-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 3548
The date of the last data update: 1995-01-31

1886-08-10 Institution established. Original name: The Illinois National Bank Of Springfield.
1988-01-29 Acquired Sangamon Bank And Trust in Springfield, Illinois.
1990-02-01 Changed name to First Of America Bank - Springfield, National Association .
1991-10-01 Acquired Morgan County Community Bank in Jacksonville, Illinois.
1992-07-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Petersburg in Petersburg, Illinois.
1994-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First of America Bank-Illinois, National Association in Bannockburn, Illinois.
1998-10-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank of Michigan/Illinois in Bannockburn, Illinois.
2004-06-19 Changed name to National City Bank Of The Midwest .
2004-07-30 Acquired Allegiant Bank in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2006-07-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
2006-08-19 Acquired Pioneer Bank And Trust Company in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2007-03-17 Acquired Harbor Federal Savings Bank in Fort Pierce, Florida.
2007-04-14 Acquired Fidelity Federal Bank & Trust in West Palm Beach, Florida.
2008-02-09 Acquired Midamerica Bank, Fsb in Clarendon Hills, Illinois.
2008-12-30 Acquired New England Trust Company, National Association in Warwick, Rhode Island.
2009-09-30 Reorganized.
2009-11-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.

Total assets: $1,161,328,000
Total deposits: $968,203,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First of America Bank - Springfield, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First of America Bank - Springfield, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First of America Bank - Springfield, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-189

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.