First Savings and Loan Association

Texas – Wichita – Burkburnett

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

31169

1959

FDIC Certificate Number: 31169
FDIC's unique number: 44003
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 637479
Report Date: 1986-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10

1959-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Savings And Loan Association.
1987-01-16 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.

Total assets: $204,538,000
Total deposits: $74,124,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-211

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.