First Star Bank, S.S.B.

Texas – Robertson – Bremond

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

1176

1905

FDIC Certificate Number: 1176
FDIC's unique number: 806
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin

Federal Reserve ID Number: 105053
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB

Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-01-25

1905-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank.
1989-03-09 Acquired Citizens Bank And Trust in Calvert, Texas.
2004-08-01 Changed name to First State Bank-bremond, S.S.B. .
2004-08-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2004-08-01 Changed institution class to Fdic Supervised Savings Bank.
2007-01-18 Changed name to First Star Bank, S.S.B. .

Total assets: $206,060,000
Total deposits: $175,712,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $175,712,000
Equity capital: $17,791,000

Net income: $839,000

Return on Assets: 0.84
Return on Equity: 9.86
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Southern Bancshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Star Bank, S.S.B. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Star Bank, S.S.B., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Star Bank, S.S.B. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-104

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.