First State Bank

Texas – Burleson – Caldwell

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

11549

1928

FDIC Certificate Number: 11549
FDIC's unique number: 7379
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin

Federal Reserve ID Number: 119452
Report Date: 1996-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-01-10

1928-12-22 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank In Caldwell.
1986-11-20 Acquired Texana National Bank Of College Station in College Station, Texas.
1987-10-22 Acquired Western National Bank in Bryan, Texas.
1989-06-21 Changed name to First State Bank .
1996-12-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First American Bank SSB in Bryan, Texas.
2000-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First American Bank, SSB in Bryan, Texas.
2003-12-11 Acquired Security Bank National Association in Garland, Texas.
2005-03-31 Changed name to Citibank Texas, National Association .
2005-03-31 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2005-03-31 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2005-03-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2005-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Bryan, Texas to Dallas, Texas.
2006-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.

Total assets: $54,454,000
Total deposits: $47,363,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.