First State Bank & Trust Company of Franklin Park

Illinois – Cook – Franklin Park

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19971

1969

FDIC Certificate Number: 19971
FDIC's unique number: 13713
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago

Federal Reserve ID Number: 866532
Report Date: 1987-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1969-06-20 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank & Trust Company Of Franklin Park.
1987-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Affiliated Bank/Franklin Park in Franklin Park, Illinois.
1990-11-01 Changed name to Affiliated Bank .
1990-11-01 Acquired Affiliated Bank/north Shore National in Chicago, Illinois.
1990-11-01 Acquired Affiliated Bank/western National in Cicero, Illinois.
1990-11-01 Acquired Affiliated Bank/dupage in Addison, Illinois.
1990-11-01 Acquired Affiliated Bank/morton Grove in Morton Grove, Illinois.
1990-11-01 Acquired Affiliated Bank/chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
1991-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Affiliated Bank in Franklin Park, Illinois.
1992-10-05 Changed name to Comerica Bank-illinois .
1992-10-22 Acquired Manufacturers Affiliated Trust Company in Chicago, Illinois.
1996-08-01 Changed name to Lasalle Bank Illinois .
1997-09-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of LaSalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
1999-04-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of LaSalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2000-03-31 Acquired Lasalle Bank, F.S.B. in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-01-31 Acquired Lasalle Interim Bank, National Association in San Diego, California.
2008-10-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $76,061,000
Total deposits: $69,533,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First State Bank & Trust Company of Franklin Park does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First State Bank & Trust Company of Franklin Park, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank & Trust Company of Franklin Park will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.