First Union Bank of Virginia

Virginia – Fairfax – Vienna

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

33751

1992

FDIC Certificate Number: 33751
FDIC's unique number: 47958
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2007012
Report Date: 1993-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-05-02

1992-12-11 Institution established. Original name: First Union Bank Of Virginia.
1992-12-11 Acquired The Sailors And Merchants Bank And Trust Company in Vienna, Virginia.
1993-07-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank of Virginia in Roanoke County, Virginia.
1993-10-27 Acquired First American Bank Of Virginia in Mclean, Virginia.
1995-04-02 Acquired Ameribanc Savings Bank, Fsb in Annandale, Virginia.
1995-11-03 Acquired Columbia First Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Arlington, Virginia.
1997-07-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-11-29 Acquired Signet Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-02-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $26,842,000
Total deposits: $24,572,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Union Bank of Virginia does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Union Bank of Virginia, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Union Bank of Virginia will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-239

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.