First Virginia Bank - Hanover

Virginia – Hanover – Ashland

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

6815

1903

FDIC Certificate Number: 6815
FDIC's unique number: 4584
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 132527
Report Date: 1985-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
OCC Charter Number: 12451
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1903-02-05 Institution established. Original name: The Hanover National Bank.
1976-05-03 Moved bank headquarters from Ashland, Virginia to Hanover County, Virginia.
1984-04-02 Changed name to First Virginia Bank - Hanover .
1985-07-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Virginia Bank - Colonial in Richmond, Virginia.
1995-11-18 Acquired First Virginia Bank - Southside in Farmville, Virginia.
1996-11-18 Acquired First Virginia Bank-south Hill in South Hill, Virginia.
2001-10-15 Acquired First Colonial Bank in Prince George, Virginia.
2003-10-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company of Virginia in Richmond, Virginia.
2006-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2007-08-18 Acquired Coastal Federal Bank in Myrtle Beach, South Carolina.
2008-12-12 Acquired Haven Trust Bank in Duluth, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-14 Acquired Colonial Bank in Montgomery, Alabama as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $55,489,000
Total deposits: $49,548,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

First Virginia Bank - Hanover does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with First Virginia Bank - Hanover, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Virginia Bank - Hanover will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-221

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.